RI S2898 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-03 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-03 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide economic incentives and assistance for the redevelopment of 111 Westminster Street using a public-private partnership.
Title
Relating To State Affairs And Government
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Committee heard |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (06/03/2014) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2898.pdf |