RI S2897 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes any vendor, agent, contractor, or designee who operates an electronic medical health record (EMR) or clinical management system to have access to the prescription drug monitoring program (PDMP).
Title
Uniformed Controlled Substance Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-05-25 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-05-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2016) |
2016-05-20 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/19/2016) |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2016) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2016) |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2016) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |