RI S2879 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the town council of New Shoreham to adopt a tax classification plan in accordance with the provisions of this section, to be applicable to taxes on or after the assessment date of December 31, 2022.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/03/2022) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2022) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |