RI S2879 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit commercial motor trucks or tractors with a gross weight exceeding four (4) tons from traveling on that portion of Route 116 known as Smith Avenue in the town of Smithfield.
Title
Truck Weight Limits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2014) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2879.pdf |