RI S2878 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds and includes marijuana concentrates into the definition of marijuana and clarifies the weight equivalent of marijuana and marijuana concentrates.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2016) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2878.pdf |