RI S2877 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts sixteen year old persons validly licensed in their native country possessing valid study work visa issued by the United States government from state motor vehicle licensing requirements.
Title
Operators' And Chauffeurs' Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Operators' and chauffeurs' lic. approval of amendment (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Operators' and chauffeurs' lic. approval of amendment (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2016) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |