RI S2877 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting That The Rhode Island Department Of Health Present A Plan For An Integrated Primary Care And Behavioral Health And Health Promotion Pilot Program
Title
Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting That The Rhode Island Department Of Health Present A Plan For An Integrated Primary Care And Behavioral Health And Health Promotion Pilot Program
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] |
Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/08/2014) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2014) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2877.pdf |