RI S2872 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - Meeting postponed (06/05/2014)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - Meeting postponed (06/05/2014)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Commending State And Local Law Enforcement Agencies On Successfully Investigating And Litigating A Settlement With Google And Respectfully Requesting That No Less Than 15 Percent Of The $230 Million Google Settlement Funds Be Used To Support Community-based Programs
Title
Senate Resolution Commending State And Local Law Enforcement Agencies On Successfully Investigating And Litigating A Settlement With Google And Respectfully Requesting That No Less Than 15 Percent Of The $230 Million Google Settlement Funds Be Used To Support Community-based Programs
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/05/2014) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2872.pdf |