RI S2869 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the proof of financial responsibility requirement for certain motor vehicle offenses and operating privileges and increases the reinstatement fee for suspended privileges.
Title
Operators' And Chauffeurs' Licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2018) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2869.pdf |