RI S2869 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt motor fuel distributors that have paid all required taxes for three (3) consecutive years from depositing a surety bond with the division of taxation, as long as the distributor remains in good standing.
Title
Motor Fuel Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Motor fuel tax approval of amendment lc 005317/2 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-19 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2014) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |