RI S2861 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For proposed wages, workers' compensation, temporary disability and unemployment benefits this act creates a new definition for "employee"
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2022) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2861.pdf |