RI S2853 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- RHODE ISLAND UTILITY FAIR SHARE ROADWAY REPAIR ACT - Requires that public utilities plan utility work in accordance with the state transportation improvement program schedules when working on state roads.
Title
Requires that public utilities plan utility work in accordance with the state transportation improvement program schedules when working on state roads.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Public Utilities And Carriers
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- RHODE ISLAND UTILITY FAIR SHARE ROADWAY REPAIR ACT
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- RHODE ISLAND UTILITY FAIR SHARE ROADWAY REPAIR ACT
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2853.pdf |