RI S2849 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Making It Easier To Do Business In Rhode Island Part 7: State Affairs And Government - Administrative Procedures (would Allow The State To Make The Regulatory, Licensing And Permitting Process Be Simultaneous)
Title
An Act Relating To Making It Easier To Do Business In Rhode Island Part 7: State Affairs And Government - Administrative Procedures (would Allow The State To Make The Regulatory, Licensing And Permitting Process Be Simultaneous)
Sponsors
Sen. Leo Blais [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. James Sheehan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-28 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-08 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-08 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to House Committee on Small Business | |
2010-05-26 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2010-05-20 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-20 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-20 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-05-06 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-05-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2849.pdf |