RI S2846 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Making It Easier To Do Business In Rhode Island Part 4: Labor And Labor Relations (would Require The Director Of Labor And Training To Appoint A Small Business Owner To The Apprentice Council)
Title
An Act Relating To Making It Easier To Do Business In Rhode Island Part 4: Labor And Labor Relations (would Require The Director Of Labor And Training To Appoint A Small Business Owner To The Apprentice Council)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-28 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-08 | House passed in concurrence | |
2010-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2010-06-08 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-05-20 | Referred to House Committee on Small Business | |
2010-05-20 | Senate read and passed | |
2010-05-18 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-13 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-05-13 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-05-06 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-05-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2846.pdf |