RI S2844 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations (exempt Airline Employees Who Work In Excess Of 40 Hrs Per Week From The Provisions Of Overtime Pay When The Excess Hrs Are Not Required By The Air Carrier But Are Arranged Through Voluntary Agreement Among Employees To Trade Scheduled Hours)
Title
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations (exempt Airline Employees Who Work In Excess Of 40 Hrs Per Week From The Provisions Of Overtime Pay When The Excess Hrs Are Not Required By The Air Carrier But Are Arranged Through Voluntary Agreement Among Employees To Trade Scheduled Hours)
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Sen. William Walaska [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | House passed in concurrence | |
2012-05-24 | Placed on House Calendar (05/30/2012) | |
2012-05-24 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2012-05-19 | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2012) | |
2012-04-26 | Referred to House Labor | |
2012-04-25 | Senate read and passed | |
2012-04-12 | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/25/2012) | |
2012-04-11 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-04-06 | Scheduled for consideration (04/11/2012) | |
2012-04-04 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-30 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2012) | |
2012-03-28 | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2844.pdf |