RI S2842 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires publishers to provide electronic book licenses to libraries and schools on reasonable terms, when a publisher offers to license electronic books and digital audiobooks to the public in Rhode Island.
Title
Electronic Book Licenses To Libraries And Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2022) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2022) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2842.pdf |