RI S2838 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Motor Vehicle Offenses (would Grant Judges And Magistrates The Authority To Prohibit Drivers Adjudicated Of Certain Motor Vehicle Offenses From Operating A Motor Vehicle That Is Not Equipped With An Ignition Interlock System.)
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Motor Vehicle Offenses (would Grant Judges And Magistrates The Authority To Prohibit Drivers Adjudicated Of Certain Motor Vehicle Offenses From Operating A Motor Vehicle That Is Not Equipped With An Ignition Interlock System.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2012-06-05 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-05-31 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-05-29 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2012) | |
2012-04-24 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-04-18 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2012) | |
2012-03-28 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2838.pdf |