RI S2835 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Distressed Areas Economic Revitalization Act (would Add Certain Federal Census Tracts Within The Town Of Middletown To The Enterprise Zone Designation Under The Distressed Areas Economic Revitalization Act.)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Distressed Areas Economic Revitalization Act (would Add Certain Federal Census Tracts Within The Town Of Middletown To The Enterprise Zone Designation Under The Distressed Areas Economic Revitalization Act.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2012-06-18 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-12 | House passed in concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-12 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-06 | Referred to House Finance | |
2012-06-05 | Senate read and passed | |
2012-05-30 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/05/2012) | |
2012-05-29 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-05-25 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2012) | |
2012-05-10 | Committee heard and continued | |
2012-05-04 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2012) | |
2012-03-28 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2835.pdf |