RI S2826 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Supporting Bilateral Trade Relations And Taiwan's Participation In International Organizations
Title
Senate Resolution Supporting Bilateral Trade Relations And Taiwan's Participation In International Organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/15/2014) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2014) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2826.pdf |