RI S2826 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Committee heard and continued
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Committee heard and continued
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities -- Distressed Communities (would Extend To Communities Which Have Been Determined To Be Highly Distressed Communities By Reference To Section 45-13-12 Of The General Laws Additional Authorization To Act In Modification Of Police And Fire Labor Contracts.)
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities -- Distressed Communities (would Extend To Communities Which Have Been Determined To Be Highly Distressed Communities By Reference To Section 45-13-12 Of The General Laws Additional Authorization To Act In Modification Of Police And Fire Labor Contracts.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Committee heard and continued | |
2012-04-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2012) | |
2012-03-22 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2826.pdf |