RI S2824 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the advisory committee on historical cemeteries to revive the program for marking governors' graves. The department of administration would administer the funding for the plaque.
Title
Advisory Commission On Historical Cemeteries
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Marc Cote [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2018-05-25 | House | Referred to House Veterans Affairs |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/23/2018) |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2018) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |