RI S2824 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Committee heard and continued
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Committee heard and continued
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities (would Prohibit Municipal Ordinances, Collective Bargaining Agreements, And Interest Arbitration Awards From Providing Employee Retirement Benefits Which Exceed The Actuarial Value Of Benefits Afforded Under The Municipal Employees Retirement System.)
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities (would Prohibit Municipal Ordinances, Collective Bargaining Agreements, And Interest Arbitration Awards From Providing Employee Retirement Benefits Which Exceed The Actuarial Value Of Benefits Afforded Under The Municipal Employees Retirement System.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Committee heard and continued | |
2012-04-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2012) | |
2012-03-22 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2824.pdf |