RI S2821 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- THE RHODE ISLAND MUNICIPAL INFRASTRUCTURE GRANT PROGRAM - Provides minor technical changes, including an update to the membership of the state planning council to include the secretary of housing or designee, and provides clarifying language relating to the role of the technical committee.
Title
Provides minor technical changes, including an update to the membership of the state planning council to include the secretary of housing or designee, and provides clarifying language relating to the role of the technical committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
State Affairs And Government
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- THE RHODE ISLAND MUNICIPAL INFRASTRUCTURE GRANT PROGRAM
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- THE RHODE ISLAND MUNICIPAL INFRASTRUCTURE GRANT PROGRAM
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2821.pdf |