RI S2821 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - Meeting postponed (05/15/2014)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - Meeting postponed (05/15/2014)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes changes to the definition of the term "resident" for purposes of the motor vehicle code and includes those who do business in the state or intrastate or declares Rhode Island his or her residence.
Title
Residents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/15/2014) |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2821.pdf |