RI S2818 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relieves Central Falls from reimbursing state for expenses related to fiscal stability act, expenses related to Central Falls school district bankruptcy proceeding, expenses of Moreau v Flanders, or expenses incurred after termination of the receivership.
Title
Relating To Central Falls
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2018) |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/29/2018) |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2818.pdf |