RI S2810 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clearly defines permanent state records to be retained/ requires preparation of disaster preparedness plan/ allows access to superior court for injunctions/ restraining orders for violations of public records laws.
Title
State Archives
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-17 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-17 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2022) |
2022-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-08 | House | Referred to House State Government & Elections |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2022) |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2022) |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |