RI S2803 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Outlines rules for disposal of toxic drug wastes.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2014) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2803.pdf |