RI S2802 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain individuals from liability for costs associated with a release of hazardous materials where ownership was acquired after January 11, 2002 under certain enumerated conditions.
Title
Industrial Property Remediation And Reuse Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-17 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-05-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/19/2016) |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/10/2016) |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/27/2016) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2016) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |