RI S2801 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution To Approve, Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (majority Vote Requirement Through Instant Runoff Voting For General Officers And General Assembly Members' Election)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution To Approve, Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (majority Vote Requirement Through Instant Runoff Voting For General Officers And General Assembly Members' Election)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-27SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2018)
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback