RI S2787 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the department of business regulation to determine the status of insurers for coordination of benefits purposes when there are two or more insurers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Insurers - Coordination Of Benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018)
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback