RI S2785 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the implementation of Title XI of the "Federal Financial Institutions Reform, Recovery & Enforcement Act of 1989".
Title
Real Estate Brokers And Salespersons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-04 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-05-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/04/2014) |
2014-05-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-05-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2014) |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2014) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/13/2014) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2014) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |