RI S2763 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes permit the growth of hemp by properly licensed individuals or entities that have met the requirements of this chapter. Also provides that higher educational institutions could grow hemp for educational and research purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Agriculture And Forestry

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-12SenateSigned by Governor
2016-07-08SenateTransmitted to Governor
2016-06-18HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2016-06-18HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/18/2016)
2016-06-18SenateSenate passed Sub A
2016-06-18SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/17/2016)
2016-06-18SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2016-06-17SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2016)
2016-05-10SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-05-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2016)
2016-03-10SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback