RI S2756 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires insurance policies to provide coverage for the use of telecommunication services rendered to subscribers who reside on islands located within the state that are not connected to the mainland by any bridge or other structure.
Title
Relating To Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Senate passed as amended |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/26/2016) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2016) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |