RI S2742 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LIBRARIES -- STATE LIBRARY - Modernizes all state library laws by eliminating the clearinghouse advisory committee, updating how the clearinghouse publishes its list of publications, reducing the number of physical copies and facilitating digital publication.
Title
Modernizes all state library laws by eliminating the clearinghouse advisory committee, updating how the clearinghouse publishes its list of publications, reducing the number of physical copies and facilitating digital publication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-04 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-05-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-30 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-05-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2024) |
2024-05-23 | House | Referred to House State Government & Elections |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2024) |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2024) |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2024) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |