RI S2737 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Video Lottery Terminal (would Provide That Additional State Revenues Gained From The Expansion Of Gambling Would Be Directed And Allocated To Support Elementary And Secondary Education In The State.)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Video Lottery Terminal (would Provide That Additional State Revenues Gained From The Expansion Of Gambling Would Be Directed And Allocated To Support Elementary And Secondary Education In The State.)
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-22 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2012) | |
2012-03-06 | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2737.pdf |