RI S2732 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exclude the property of any agency or public body from the provisions of "The Rhode Island Museum Property Act."
Title
Museum Property Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-05-28 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (05/28/2014) |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/20/2014) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/14/2014) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2014) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2014) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |