RI S2714 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-12 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-12 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Insurance (would Add A Trend Test To The Risk Based Capital Statutes Governing Insurers And Health Organizations, Financial Health Determinations)
Title
An Act Relating To Insurance (would Add A Trend Test To The Risk Based Capital Statutes Governing Insurers And Health Organizations, Financial Health Determinations)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-12 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-04 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-05-27 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-05-25 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-05-25 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-05-25 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-05 | Referred to House Corporations | |
2010-05-04 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-04-27 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-04-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-06 | Committee heard | |
2010-04-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-30 | Meeting postponed | |
2010-03-30 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-24 | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2714.pdf |