RI S2713 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - Senate voted to recommit to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - Senate voted to recommit to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirement that information contained in any prescription drug monitoring database be provided to law enforcement only pursuant to a search warrant, if in connection with a specific investigation.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Senate | Senate voted to recommit to Senate Judiciary |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/02/2016) |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2016) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2016) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2713.pdf |