RI S2706 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits any contractual clause in a contract for home repairs which would limit the homeowners ability to initiate legal proceedings against the contractor for breach of contract.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contractors' Registration And Licensing Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2018)
2018-03-20SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback