RI S2695 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-15 - Referred to House Committee on Small Business
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-15 - Referred to House Committee on Small Business
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES -- MANUFACTURING AND WHOLESALE LICENSES - Allows for the holder of a manufacturer's license to be able to sell one one-sixth (1/6) barrel key of malt beverage, produced on the premises, per day.
Title
Allows for the holder of a manufacturer's license to be able to sell one one-sixth (1/6) barrel key of malt beverage, produced on the premises, per day.
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. David Tikoian [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | House | Referred to House Committee on Small Business |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/14/2024) |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2024) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |