RI S2690 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits opticians to sell or dispense contact lenses when presented with a prescription from a licensed optometrist or physician.
Title
Opticians
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2016) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2690.pdf |