RI S2679 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that insurance companies may not mandate the use of aftermarket parts without the owner's consent on motor vehicles less than 48 months beyond manufacture date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Body Replacement Parts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - Senate - Body replacement parts approval of amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-05-15SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/15/2018)
2018-05-08SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-04SenateScheduled for consideration (05/08/2018)
2018-04-03SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018)
2018-03-20SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback