RI S2679 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - Senate voted to recommit to Senate Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - Senate voted to recommit to Senate Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the monthly minimum benefits of spouses and domestic partners of retired teachers, and authorizes additional yearly non-compounded adjustments.
Title
Teacher Retirement Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate voted to recommit to Senate Finance |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2016) |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2016) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2679.pdf |