RI S2671 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the health services council from twelve (12) to twenty-four (24) members and amends the hospital conversion act relative to disclosure.
Title
The Hospital Conversion Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2018) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2671.pdf |