RI S2668 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes the director and other positions of the state crime laboratory employees of the council on postsecondary education as opposed to limited appointments positions of the board of governors.
Title
State Crime Laboratory
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2016) |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/01/2016) |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2016) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |