RI S2660 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires verification of computer hours worked by contractors for professional technical services rendered to depts of transportation, health, human services, administration and commerce in excess of $100,000 for bids/proposals issued on/after 7/1/18.
Title
Department Of Administration
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2018) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2660.pdf |