RI S2659 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new process for the eviction of residential tenants in mortgage foreclosed property which requires the existence of just cause
Title
Landlord And Tenant Act
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Sen. James Doyle [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2014) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |