RI S2646 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Procedure - Sentence And Execution (allows The District Court, Family Court Or Superior Court To Place A Person On A Deferred Sentence And Also Provides That The Courts May Seal Any Records After Completion Of The Sentence In Accordance With Law)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Procedure - Sentence And Execution (allows The District Court, Family Court Or Superior Court To Place A Person On A Deferred Sentence And Also Provides That The Courts May Seal Any Records After Completion Of The Sentence In Accordance With Law)
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Charles Levesque [D] | Sen. Charles Levesque [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-08 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-06-04 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2010-06-03 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2010-06-01 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-27 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-06 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-04-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-30 | Meeting postponed | |
2010-03-30 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2646.pdf |