RI S2645 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires individuals transacting business in RI under any assumed name to file in person, by mail, or electronically with the office of the city or town clerk the true or real full name(s) of the person(s) transacting business and their email address.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions -- Filing Of Assumed Name
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2022) |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2022) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |