RI S2621 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the affordable housing eligibility standards for households in New Shoreham with gross household income of less than one hundred and forty percent (140%) of area median income.
Title
Rhode Island Housing Resources Act Of 1998
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2022-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-15 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2022) |
2022-05-26 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2022) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |